Register of Charities - The Charity Commission EMMANUEL COLLEGE
Charity number: 1093739-3
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 JANUARY 2005 AND CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION WITH A BROADLY BASED CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED: IN PRACTICE GATESHEAD
Registration history
- 19 May 2005: Standard registration
- 25 August 2011: Removed (Exempt charity)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.