THE MULBERRY CENTRE

Charity number: 1108999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Walk-in cancer centre offering support and information services to all people affected by cancer.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing
  • Hounslow
  • Richmond Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aileen McLeish Chair 30 November 2020
THE MOUNT SCHOOL YORK FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Paul James Hugh Dunn Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Suzanne Rawcliffe Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Docherty Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Nigel Peter George Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Dr Gayatri Shah Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Piers Ronald Allen Trustee 22 August 2022
THE RICHMOND UPON THAMES VOLUNTARY FUND
Received: On time
Christopher David Bezant Trustee 22 August 2022
None on record
Heather Loyce Scott Taylor Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
MATHIAS HERBERT WINKLER-WULFF Trustee 16 March 2013
None on record
GRACE GAIL MARY GIBBS Trustee 16 March 2013
None on record
Joy Pearce Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £377.00k £484.00k £504.76k £708.40k £667.73k
Total expenditure £368.00k £435.00k £460.00k £564.99k £669.52k
Income from government contracts £40.00k £40.00k £39.91k £29.10k £31.39k
Income from government grants £26.00k £23.00k £33.00k £183.20k £134.97k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £407.15k £650.26k £620.86k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £6.61k £23.06k £5.29k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £69.51k £29.10k £31.39k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £3.18k £5.97k £10.20k
Income - Other N/A N/A £18.31k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £5.00k £59.98k £25.90k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £369.00k £441.12k £511.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £91.00k £123.87k £158.43k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.35k £2.52k £2.65k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £58.16k £53.96k £45.56k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £144.61k £137.36k £150.63k
Other assets N/A N/A £134.09k £351.80k £332.94k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £56.55k £126.65k £101.19k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 25 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 25 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WEST MIDDLESEX UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL
TWICKENHAM ROAD
ISLEWORTH
TW7 6AF
Phone:
02083216300