FAIRSHARE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main areas of charitable activity are in campaigning and education of the public in the principles, practice and effects of responsible and ethical investment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£6,564,093
Donations and legacies | £1.09m | |
Charitable activities | £4.98m | |
Other trading activities | £462.24k | |
Investments | £18.44k | |
Other | £11.42k |
Total expenditure:
£6,545,460
Raising funds | £391.09k | |
Charitable activities | £6.15m | |
Other | £0 |
-£788 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £391.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.15m | |
Retained for future use | £18.63k |
People

90 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2006: Standard registration
- FAIRPENSIONS (Working name)
- SHAREACTION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liubov Nikulina | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
June Hutchison Boyle | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clifford Wales | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexia Wai-Chun Tye | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Ian Stuart Brindley | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Glicher | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Chih-Cheng Chuah | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Steenland | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64m | £3.12m | £3.61m | £5.06m | £6.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.67m | £2.84m | £3.49m | £4.83m | £6.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £506.70k | £313.53k | £55.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £583.76k | £710.77k | £706.24k | £919.85k | £1.09m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £115.36k | £272.01k | £357.94k | £422.14k | £462.24k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.92m | £2.08m | £2.52m | £3.70m | £4.98m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £634 | £174 | £299 | £286 | £18.44k | |
|
Income - Other | £12.62k | £66.62k | £21.51k | £25.81k | £11.42k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.59m | £2.75m | £3.39m | £4.57m | £6.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £83.72k | £88.48k | £103.24k | £257.38k | £391.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £12.10k | £10.63k | £11.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £102.41k | £43.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.43k | £3.57k | £7.30k | £8.32k | £7.41k | |
|
Other assets | £1.85m | £2.47m | £2.27m | £4.92m | £4.13m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.08m | £1.42m | £1.11m | £3.52m | £2.71m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 01 December 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 01 December 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2014 as amended on 12 Jun 2019 as amended on 13 Sep 2022 as amended on 07 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
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
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Runway East
The Hickman Building
2 Whitechapel Road
LONDON
E1 1EW
- Phone:
- 02074037800
- Email:
- info@shareaction.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window