Accounts and annual returns HOUSE OF PROSPERITY INTERNATIONAL CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1109089
Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 152 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 152 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 518 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 518 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 883 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 883 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1248 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1248 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days