Financial history JOHN ACKROYD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £33.79k £26.23k £28.22k £29.53k £28.38k
Total expenditure £90.24k £86.41k £128.02k £46.18k £42.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A