Home-Start Wessex

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Wessex is a family support charity that provides vital care to families at a crucial time in their lives. The support is offered to families with at least one child under 5 through individually designed packages of practical and emotional help lasting for around 6 months. This is either provided with one-to-one support in their own homes or through group support and therapy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,975 from 1 government contract(s) and £50,000 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 14 April 2005: Standard registration
- 17 January 2025: Funds received from 1122122 HOME-START WEST DORSET
- HOME-START (BOURNEMOUTH & POOLE) (Previous name)
- HOME-START SOUTH EAST DORSET (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Critchell | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Stevens | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Stubbs | Trustee | 09 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA NICOLA FELICITY WILKES | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.84k | £264.52k | £224.46k | £269.88k | £418.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.20k | £233.09k | £232.85k | £285.07k | £390.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £9.98k | £9.98k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.58k | £11.98k | N/A | £15.92k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 2005 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 JULY 2006 as amended on 05 May 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2022 as amended on 09 May 2024 as amended on 12 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are: a) to safeguard, protect and preserve the good health, both mental and physical of children and parents of children; b) to prevent cruelty to or maltreatment of children; c) to relieve sickness, poverty and need amongst children and parents of children; d) to promote the education of the public in better standards of child care across the Wessex conurbation which includes, Bournemouth, Poole, Christchurch, the Purbecks, Dorchester, Weymouth, Portland, Bridport and its environs.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE AREA OF BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOME-START
1462 WIMBORNE ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH10 7AS
- Phone:
- 01202574877
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window