CARE PAKISTAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to provide free education for underprivileged children in Pakistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Pakistan
Governance
- 19 April 2005: Standard registration
- EDUCARE PAKISTAN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED SHEZAD ABEDI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AMBREEN ZAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAISAL IRFAN MIAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NADEEM SHAIKH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.77k | £91.88k | £102.96k | £189.57k | £84.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.84k | £23.00k | £133.06k | £203.81k | £82.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 25 April 2025 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 25 April 2025 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2025 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2023
(These accounts |
03 January 2025 | 333 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 March 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 27 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 27 March 2022 | 415 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 March 2022 | 415 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 8TH FEBRUARY 2005, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8TH MARCH 2006 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT CARE SCHOOLS AND CARE-ADOPTED GOVERNMENT SCHOOLS BASED IN PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN PAKISTAN BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS OR SICKNESS OR DISABILITY
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARE Pakistan
2nd Floor Atlas House
173 Victoria Street
London
SW1E 5NH
- Phone:
- 0207 598 7700
- Email:
- info@carepakistan.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window