BRITISH OBESITY SURGERY PATIENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing information about weight loss surgery to members of the public and healthcare professionals and supporting patients and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 2005: Standard registration
- BOSPA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Meakin | Trustee | 17 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen May Kirkland | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
robin joyce | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.36k | £3.19k | £120 | £514 | £1.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60k | £4.02k | £126 | £90 | £497 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 2005, 17 DECEMBER 2006 AND 22 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM OBESITY AND WEIGHT RELATED PROBLEMS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE PLANNING TO OR WHO HAVE UNDERGONE SURGERY, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM NECESSARY INCLUDING ASSOCIATION WITH HEALTH PROFESSIONALS WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE SERVICES PROVIDED AND THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Keward Avenue
WELLS
BA5 1TS
- Phone:
- 07736800642
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window