FRIENDS OF LONG SUTTON CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to contribute towards the cost of projects for the preservation and maintenance of Holy Trinity church, Long Sutton, Somerset. The main activities are the raising of funds from membership subscriptions, donations and events in order to make grants to the Parochial Church Council (PCC) for projects covered by the object.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 25 April 2005: Standard registration
- FOLSC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID AITKEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charles Walford | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Cox | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Turner | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY PRINGLE | Trustee | 11 February 2009 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £967 | £2.25k | £10.86k | £7.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £1.41k | £30.43k | £5.25k | £11.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2005,
Charitable objects
TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE COST OF SUCH SPECIFIC PROJECTS FOR THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT, BEAUTIFICATION AND RECONSTRUCTION OF HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, LONG SUTTON, SOMERSET ('LONG SUTTON CHURCH') WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE REQUIRED AND WHICH THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL ('PCC') HAS FROM TIME TO TIME IDENTIFIED AND WISHES TO UNDERTAKE OR WHICH THE TRUSTEES HAVE REQUESTED THAT THE PCC UNDERTAKE SUBJECT TO THE CONSENT OF THE PCC. THE WORK MAY INCLUDE THE BELL TOWER, ROOFS, WALLS, WINDOWS, DOORS, FOUNDATIONS, STONEWORK, PORCHES AND ALL FIXTURES AND FITTINGS AND FURNITURE AND MONUMENTS, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS WHETHER IN THE CHURCH OR THE CHURCHYARD AND THE ORGAN AND ALL SERVICE INSTALLATIONS PROVIDED THAT THERE SHALL BE SPECIFICALLY EXCLUDED ALL GENERAL RUNNING COSTS OF THE CHURCH SUCH AS LIGHTING, HEATING, RATES, TAXES, INSURANCE'S AND THE COST OF PROVIDING SERVICES AND OTHER EVENTS WHETHER FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP OR OTHERWISE AND ALL OTHER REGULAR OUTGOINGS FALLING UNDER THE HEADING OF GENERAL HOUSEKEEPING. THE PROJECT FOR CONTRIBUTION ('THE WORK') SHALL BE AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES AND AS AGREED BY THEM WITH THE PCC. THE AMOUNT OF A PARTICULAR CONTRIBUTION ('THE GRANT') SHALL BE AS DETERMINED ENTIRELY AT THEIR DISCRETION BY THE TRUSTEES AND AGREED BY THE PCC. UNLESS OTHERWISE AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES IT SHALL BE APPLIED TO NO OTHER PURPOSE. IF NOT APPLIED THE SUM GRANTED SHALL BE RETURNED BY THE PCC TO THE TRUSTEES. THE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND MANAGEMENT OF THE WORK WILL REMAIN ENTIRELY THAT OF THE PCC.
Area of benefit
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH, LONG SUTTON, SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
UPTON BRIDGE COTTAGE
LANGPORT ROAD
LONG SUTTON
LANGPORT
TA10 9NQ
- Phone:
- 01458241371
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window