TORO COMMUNITY WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Medical/Health/Sickness Disability Relief of Poverty Overseas aid/Famine relief Arts/culture Economic/Community development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 September 2005: Standard registration
- TCW&DA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Davis Kunihira | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Charles Musana | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Gunn-Mugisha | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Rusoke | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Damalie Kabasomi | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evah Baguma | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ainebyona | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kisembo | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Nyamata | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Favour Kwesiga | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Birungi | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Drake Mugisa | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pascal Mugarra | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anastasia Wairimu | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzan Tushabe | Trustee | 17 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £2.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 April 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 February 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 April 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 28TH OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 7TH MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN ORIGIN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY PEOPLE OF TORO RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS BENEFICIARIES) BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING, INFORMATION, ADVICE, SUPPORT AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS WHICH THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (2) TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFICIARIES WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING TRAINING.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 10 Chessington Business Centre
37 Cox Lane
CHESSINGTON
Surrey
KT9 1SD
- Phone:
- 07903425539
- Email:
- mugisa@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window