BUSHEY AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(i) to advance the education of the public and in particular the education of older people no longer in full time gainful employment in Bushey, Hertfordshire and its surrounding locality, (ii) to provide facilities for leisure time and recreational activities with the object of improving the conditions of life for the above persons in the interests of their social welfare,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Lampert | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Benjamin | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
DENISE RICKWOOD | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
susan galan | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Apple | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Freed | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raglan Jane Sanders | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Norman Steel | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Baron | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gunton | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Wendy Wright | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.17k | £16.79k | £5.03k | £26.14k | £35.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.43k | £12.06k | £9.08k | £22.14k | £32.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 FEB 2004 AS AMENDED ON 15 FEB 2005 AS AMENDED ON 22 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2010 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
BUSHEY, HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27a Bournehall Road
Bushey
Watford
Hertfordshire
WD23 3EH
- Phone:
- 02033088170
- Email:
- andrew.gunton.u3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window