Accounts and annual returns LEYBURN AND MID-WENSLEYDALE PARTNERSHIP LIMITED

Charity number: 1111746
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 30 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 June 2020 On Time