Financial history THE KEMPSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1109049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £97.86k £64.82k £99.51k £113.28k £122.30k
Total expenditure £99.00k £71.92k £96.40k £124.94k £123.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £29.09k £5.82k N/A N/A