Financial history DARTMOOR PONY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1109196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £80.74k £77.79k £79.35k £61.50k £23.24k
Total expenditure £87.54k £85.84k £115.37k £117.14k £132.52k
Income from government contracts £23.75k £16.26k £16.35k £15.56k N/A
Income from government grants £250 £10.25k £10.00k £11.55k £14.36k