DARTMOOR PONY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in response to widespread concern about the viability and long-term survival of the traditional Dartmoor Heritage pony on Dartmoor. We provide: direct grants to breeders and keepers, grazing on Bellever, organisation of multi-year scientific studies, educational walks and talks on Heritage Ponies, advocacy for Heritage Ponies breeders. In addition we promote sale of Heritage Ponies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,360 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 22 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Lithgow | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Pearse | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Giles Sheldon | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.74k | £77.79k | £79.35k | £61.50k | £23.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.54k | £85.84k | £115.37k | £117.14k | £132.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £23.75k | £16.26k | £16.35k | £15.56k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £10.25k | £10.00k | £11.55k | £14.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 2005, as amended on 28 Sep 2022 as amended on 28 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE AS A SPECIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE NATIVE PONIES OF DARTMOOR AND TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dartmoor Pony Heritage Trust
21 Silver Street
Ottery St Mary
Devon
EX11 1DB
- Phone:
- 01626 833234
- Email:
- admin@dpht.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window