INDEPENDENT CINEMA OFFICE

Charity Number: 1109053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Film programming advice and bookings for non profit cinemas; training programmes of non-commercial cinemas; training for the independent exhibition sector; distribution of films; consultancy; organising events for film societies and independent cinemas; advocacy for the sector and grant giving.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ICO (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DOROTHY JOAN WILSON Chair 01 July 2016
None on record
Anthony Lee Trustee 07 April 2025
None on record
Dr Sita Thomas Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Richard McDonald Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Dr Hiu Man Chan Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Yi Wang Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Dr Rowan Aust Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Eleanor Lowe Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Will Massa Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Ayo Akingbade Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Harry Kalfayan Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Thea Elizabeth Burrows Trustee 11 June 2020
None on record
Sudha Bhuchar Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
Simon Richard Ward Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.77m £1.53m £1.67m £1.94m £1.70m
Total expenditure £1.70m £1.44m £1.74m £2.06m £1.64m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £139.33k £14.55k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £280 £149.43k £14.55k £181 £249
Income - Other trading activities £13.31k £0 £6.54k £7.24k £6.27k
Income - Charitable activities £1.75m £1.38m £1.65m £1.93m £1.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £861 £239 £97 £453 £2.97k
Income - Other £9.14k £0 £363 £1.40k £3.97k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.44m £1.73m £2.05m £1.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.10k £7.45k £13.46k £22.07k £15.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £231.56k £318.10k £183.20k £303.28k £271.93k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £13.31k £0 £6.54k £7.24k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.37m £1.34m £1.12m £1.11m £1.04m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £855.19k £762.50k £908.74k £635.42k £614.45k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.48m £1.28m £1.27m £1.11m £963.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
INDEPENDENT CINEMA OFFICE
9 Bickels Yard
151-153 Bermondsey Street
LONDON
SE1 3HA
Phone:
02076367120