THE GENERATION JOURNEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thailand-Setting up a self-sustaining village for the elderly & young that have no-one to care for them.This has been the main Generation Journey project since 2006.The help and support will continue for many years. South Africa-not working in SA at present. UK-We are doing small projects for the young & elderly together.We are still looking for a more substantial programme to set up in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- South Africa
- Thailand
Governance
- 28 April 2005: Standard registration
- 10 April 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 April 2014: Funds transferred to 1156133 THE MISSING KIND
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.19k | £13.22k | £18 | £1.01k | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.20k | £20.58k | £9.85k | £10.28k | £3.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 04 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 03 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 25TH APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED (ESPECIALLY CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THE ELDERLY) THROUGHOUT SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY: (A) SUPPORTING THEIR DEVELOPMENT FROM CHILDHOOD TO INDEPENDENT ADULTS INTEGRATING THEM WITH THEIR NATURAL COMMUNITIES; (B) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING HOMES, RESIDENCES AND ORPHANAGES FOR THOSE IN NEED OF THEM; AND SUPPORTING THOSE ELDERLY PERSONS IN NEED IN THEIR OWN HOMES; AND (C) ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT (INCLUDING SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES) SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.' THE TRUSTEES WILL FURTHER THE ABOVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE TO THE GUIDELINES WHICH ARE OUTLINE IN THE ANNEX TO THIS DOCUMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window