Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SUNDERLAND TEACHING PRIMARY CARE TRUST CHARITY
Charity Number: 1059831-5
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10/10/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 5/6/2003 AND 21/7/2003 AND STATUTORY INSTRUMENT 2005 NO.456
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR THE SERVICES PROVIDED BY SUNDERLAND TEACHING PRIMARY CARE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 06 April 2005: Standard registration
- 14 August 2009: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 August 2009: Funds transferred to 1059831 SOUTH OF TYNE AND WEARSIDE MENTAL HEALTH NHS TRUST...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.