SAFETY NET - PEOPLE FIRST (SNPF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support people with learning disabilities to be self-advocates. Organise meetings, campaigns, 1 to 1 work, training, information, advocacy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 17 June 2005: Standard registration
- SNPF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FAISAL YUSUF | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WOOD | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.68k | £48.13k | £49.48k | £53.76k | £47.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £47.16k | £44.12k | £44.03k | £19.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £45.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.00k | £4.47k | £45.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIVE AND SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES LIVING OR WORKING IN HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM THROUGH SERVICES WHICH WILL ENABLE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE EDUCATIONAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION OF ALL PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES THROUGH TRAINING, WORKSHOPS, GROUP WORK.
Area of benefit
HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dawes Road Hub
20 Dawes Road
LONDON
SW6 7EN
- Phone:
- 02087485168
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window