THE DERWENT AND WYE VALLEY RAILWAY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitiy objectives are to acquire, restore, preserve and operate a representative collection of heritage railway buildings, structures, rolling stock and artefacts fo use by, exhibition to and for the education of the public in the infrastructure, management and operation of railways between Ambergate and Buxton in the County of Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 May 2005: Standard registration
- DWVRT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Lathrope | Chair | 02 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Edward Sealey | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Richard Carabine | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL MORGAN | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SANDRA MORGAN | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £1.81k | £610 | £4.67k | £8.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.89k | £814 | £319 | £2.61k | £1.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 12TH NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 MAY 2006 AND 1 JULY 2008 as amended on 24 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
TO OBTAIN, RESTORE, PRESERVE, AND OPERATE A REPRESENTATIVE COLLECTION OF HERITAGE RAILWAY BUILDINGS, STRUCTURES, ROLLING STOCK AND ARTEFACTS FOR USE BY, EXHIBITION TO AND FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE INFRASTRUCTURE, MANAGEMENT AND THE OPERATION OF RAILWAYS BETWEEN AMBERGATE AND BUXTON IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE.
Area of benefit
AMBERGATE AND BUXTON IN THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowsley South Station
Harrison Way
Darley Dale
MATLOCK
Derbyshire
DE4 2LF
- Phone:
- 01629 580381
- Email:
- dwvrtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
WWW.DWVRT.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window