TITCHFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the people of Titchfield and local area by associating together, without distinction, the inhabitants with local authorities, voluntary and other organisations to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure activities and to improve the conditions of life. To maintain a community centre for these purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £176 from 1 government contract(s) and £2,253 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 April 2005: Standard registration
- TCA (Working name)
- TITCHFIELD COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph McLaughlin | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Taylor | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Elaine David | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Girdler | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|||||
SANDRA PATRICIA JONES | Trustee | 04 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH ROBBIN MOORE | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JULIAN LIDGETT GIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER FRANK MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE ANN STEEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.37k | £156.34k | £185.89k | £195.01k | £195.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.30k | £160.97k | £172.52k | £211.28k | £204.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £30 | £219 | £176 | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.06k | £90.72k | £31.91k | £10.83k | £2.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TITCHFIELD AND DISTRICT AND THAT PART OF THE BOROUGH OF FAREHAM, WEST OF THE A32 AND NEWGATE LANE, TOGETHER WITH THE ELECTORAL DISTRICT OF CURBRIDGE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE, FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; (C) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. AND THAT IN THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS THE COMPANY SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
TITCHFIELD AND DISTRICT AND THAT PART OF THE BOROUGH OF FAREHAM, WEST OF THE A32 AND NEWGATE LANE, TOGETHER WITH THE ELECTORAL DISTRICT OF CURBRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Titchfield Community Association
Titchfield Community Centre
Mill Street
Titchfield
FAREHAM
PO14 4AB
- Phone:
- 01329842933
- Website:
-
titchfieldcommunitycentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window