EDUCATION FOUNDATION OF ENGLAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIEF OF HUMAN SUFFERING THROUGH SKILLS TRAINING AT A COMMUNITY BASED LEVEL ESPECIALY SINGLE MUMS WITH CHALLENGING BOYS,WE OFFER TALK THERAPY,AIDS AND HIV VICTIMS WE OFFER COUNSELLING.WE WELLCOME ANYONE TO WORK WITH US,WITH NO BIAS WE ARE NON RELIGIOUS GROUP, WE WORK ACROSS ALL PARTY LINES.CURRENT THEME IS REDUCING SEXUAL VIOLENCE AMONG WOMEN THROUGH EDUCATION,REFFERING THEM TO CORRECT CHANNEL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
Governance
- 14 July 2005: Standard registration
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- EFE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2007 | 01/09/2008 | 01/09/2009 | 01/09/2010 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2010 | 05 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2009 | 04 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO HAVE OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF LEAVING MAINSTREAM OR FURTHER EDUCATION AS A RESULT OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE, PERSONAL CRISIS, CRIMINAL ACTIVITY, DISAFFECTION OR OTHER REASONS, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT IN CONTINUING THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window