KALI MATA MANDIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 November 2005: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2007 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 7TH JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6TH OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION BY PROMOTING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF TEMPLE, TO BE KNOWN AS THE "MANDIR", IN THE MIDDLESEX AREA. THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, BOTH WITHIN U.K. AND OVERSEAS, BY THE PROVISIONS OF FINANCIAL OR MATERIAL ASSISTANCE TO THOSE IN NEED. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE HOSPITALISED AND THE ELDERLY, BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATIONAL OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
MIDDLESEX, UK AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window