THE CATHERINE BULLEN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation is actively supporting in practical terms three schools in the Omaheke Region Namibia. They are Omuhaturua Primary School, Donkerbos Primary School and Eiseb Primary School supplying equipment and uniforms etc. It is also supporting the Otjimanangombe Primary Healthcare Clinic and the Catherine Bullen Primary Healthcare Clinic with the provision of medical equipment and maintenance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Namibia
Governance
- 21 July 2005: Standard registration
- THE CATHERINE BULLEN MEMORIAL FUND (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER WESLEY JOHANNES BULLEN MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Shirley Victoria Hodgson | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rachel Mary Gooden | Trustee | 25 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr STEPHANIE MONICA CHALMERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr ELIZABETH GWYTHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LINDA SUSAN BULLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID ANTHONY CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.98k | £59.16k | £46.41k | £50.47k | £60.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.17k | £4.28k | £6.91k | £35.38k | £66.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 6TH MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 MAY 2005 AND AS AMENDED 14 SEPTEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN RURAL NAMIBIA, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE OMHATURUA PRIMARY SCHOOL AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF OTJIMANANGOMBE IN EASTERN NAMIBIA, BY THE FUNDING OF COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FRESH WATER SUPPLIES, MEDICAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES AND SUCH OTHER FACILITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM NECESSARY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NAMIBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 COLCHESTER ROAD
WEST MERSEA
COLCHESTER
CO5 8RS
- Phone:
- 01206383368
- Email:
- info@namibia-aid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window