Accounts and annual returns THE GOOD SHEPHERD OF CHILDREN AND ORPHANS

Charity number: 1110540
Charity reporting is overdue by 1782 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
Annual return 20 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
Annual return 20 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
Annual return 20 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1417 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1417 days
Annual return 20 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1782 days
Accounts and TAR 20 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1782 days