HARINGEY AFRICAN CULTURAL VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise awareness of The African through music, dance, drama, hand crafts and languages in eight London boroughs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Barnet
- Camden
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 13 June 2005: Standard registration
- HACVO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KASOZI MUKASA EMMANUEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
hussein kanyike | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
charles kalule | Trustee | 03 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/11/2020 | 02/11/2021 | 02/11/2022 | 02/11/2023 | 02/11/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 November 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2021 | 21 August 2024 | 719 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2020 | 21 August 2024 | 1084 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 20 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 MOUNT PLEASANT ROAD
LONDON
N17 6TH
- Phone:
- 02084938699
- Email:
- kszemmanuel2@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window