LATIN AMERICA BUREAU (RESEARCH AND ACTION) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research and analysis about social, economic, political issues in Latin America and the Caribbean to be published on our website, e-mail newsletter, via social media. Book and report publishing and distribution. Working with partner non-governmental organizations in the region and assisting them to publicize their work and concerns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcela Lopez Levy | Chair | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Elizabeth Etchart | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamille Pinheiro Dias | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Plunkett | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily Gregg | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rebecca Morris | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Mcilwaine | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Shafik Meghji | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE GELBER | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEHMANN | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.11k | £48.24k | £51.92k | £29.38k | £50.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.60k | £34.50k | £48.24k | £38.58k | £48.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 1 APRIL 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
3 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE (I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ISSUES OF SOCIAL, POLITICAL AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE, HUMAN RIGHTS AND OTHER RELATED SUBJECTS IN LATIN AMERICAN AND CARIBBEAN COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COMMISSIONING, PUBLISHING AND PROMOTING BOOKS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY FOR AN ENGLISH-LANGUAGE READERSHIP; AND TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; AND (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LATIN AMERICAN AND CARIBBEAN HERITAGE AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACORN COTTAGE
BLAEN-Y-MYARTH
LLANGYNIDR
CRICKHOWELL
NP8 1NQ
- Phone:
- 01874 730164
- Email:
- Mike.Gatehouse@lab.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window