Financial history LOWLAND SEARCH DOGS (SUSSEX)

Charity number: 1110700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.98k £5.86k £4.68k £19.25k £17.32k
Total expenditure £8.42k £5.44k £6.83k £6.33k £9.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A