CENTRE FOR WOMEN'S CAREER DEVELOPMENT & SUCCESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE SERVICES THAT BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE WORKS AT 98 PER CENT WITH DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE FROM THE BAME COMMUNITIES, IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS: EMPLOYMENT SKILLS DEVELOPMENT TRAINING, AFTER SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, COMMUNITY INFORMATION PROVISIONS, HEALTH PROMOTIONS, GENERAL & LEGAL ADVICE, HERITAGE & CULTURE, COMMUNITY COHESION, UNDERSTANDING OF UK DEMOCRACY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
- Congo
- Mali
Governance
- 09 May 2005: Standard registration
- CWCDS UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amani Suleman | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mariam Ibrahim | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
IMMACULATE AKURUT OLISO | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SAFI KIBANGULA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ADEBAYO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MITCHOU LISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £300 | £800 | £300 | £450 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £200 | £600 | £150 | £250 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 May 2022 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 December 2020 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT WILL BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON BOROUGHS OF LEWISHAM, SOUTHWARK, LAMBETH, GREENWICH AND ELSEWHERE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN AND CARIBBEAN DECENT AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING: I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS II) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT III) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IV) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH V) THE PROVISION AND ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF LEWISHAM, SOUTHWARK, LAMBETH, GREENWICH AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEWISHAM RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL
SUITE 109-109
BILT MANSIONS
4-16 Deptford Bridge
LONDON
SE8 4HH
- Phone:
- 07951458562
- Email:
- cwcdsuk@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window