THE ROCHE COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of the public concerning fine art, sculpture and in particular to educate children and young persons about the same. Also to promote the education of children and young persons by the provision of advice and guidance in relation to careers in the arts to enable them to reach their full potential and prepare them for working life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 29 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Madeleine Bessborough FRCA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Goltz | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Olivia Warham | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Richard Grant | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.87k | £165.30k | £167.93k | £110.29k | £70.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.91k | £140.69k | £168.15k | £115.66k | £67.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.43k | N/A | N/A | £4.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 APRIL 2005,
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING FINE ART AND SCULPTURE AND IN PARTICULAR TO EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS ABOUT THE SAME WHETHER SUCH WORKS OF ART ARE ON DISPLAY AT ROCHE COURT OR OTHERWISE. 2. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND GUIDANCE IN RELATION TO CAREERS IN THE ARTS TO ENABLE THEM TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AND PREPARE THEM FOR WORKING LIFE. 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (THE 'OBJECTS')
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCHE COURT
EAST WINTERSLOW
SALISBURY
SP5 1BG
- Phone:
- 01980862244
- Email:
- groups@sculpture.uk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window