Accounts and annual returns THE ST. IVES YOUTH THEATRE

Charity number: 1109377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 20 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required