Accounts and annual returns THE BILL JORDAN FOUNDATION FOR WILDLIFE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1109575
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2009 23 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2009 23 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2008 29 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2007 18 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2007 18 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2006 02 May 2008 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2006 29 February 2008 152 days late
Annual return 30 November 2005 13 December 2006 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2005 13 December 2006 74 days late