THE BROCKLEY CROSS ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various Community Gardening Events on Brockley Common during the year BXAG assisting Transition Brockley members in planting new Community Orchard Annual Brockley Christmas Market BXAG leads community response to Lewisham co draft proposals for public realm improvements to BX Brockley Common harvesting event BXAG launches new website BXAG Annual Open Forum Brockley Common Halloween event
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Lewisham
Governance
- 05 September 2005: Standard registration
- BCAG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Furlong | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erin Essex | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Destre | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.13k | £144 | £5.42k | £11.55k | £13.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.51k | £1.56k | £2.98k | £7.28k | £10.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 May 2023 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 23 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BROCKLEY CROSS, LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SAID INHABITANTS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BROCKLEY CROSS, LONDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS,
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Avignon Road
LONDON
SE4 2JT
- Phone:
- 07799145117
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window