ARENA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide nursery school education for orphans and children from very poor families. We also provide them with at least one meal a day as most of them come to the school very hungry. At any given time we have between 16-20 children but we have a capacity for 50. We are currently unable to take on more due to lack of funds. The nursery school is in Kenya. The demand to take more children is high.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kenya
Governance
- 17 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMAECHI IHETU | Trustee | 20 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL WANJUHI IHETU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/04/2020 | 26/04/2021 | 26/04/2022 | 26/04/2023 | 26/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.80k | £1.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £200 | £200 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 April 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 April 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS, THROUGH PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ORPHANED OR OTHERWISE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: KENYA, AFRICA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4th Floor
18 St. Cross Street
EC1 8UN
- Phone:
- 02073765967
- Email:
- wihetu@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window