BLACK AND ETHNIC MINORITY EXPERIENCE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in the history and experience of African Caribbean, Asian and other ethnic minority groups in Wolverhampton by the collection, collation and dissemination of historical materials of historical materials, personal and community histories/commentaries and by the conduct of related educational projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 July 2005: Standard registration
- BE-ME (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Richard Adrian Hawkins | Chair | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
LANCE DUNKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TYRRELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANK CYRIL CHALLENGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD MOTAWALLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.66k | £0 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.32k | £0 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 30TH SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 15TH JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY AND EXPERIENCE OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN, ASIAN AND OTHER ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS IN WOLVERHAMPTON BY THE COLLECTION, COLLATION AND DISSEMINATION OF HISTORICAL MATERIALS, PERSONAL AND COMMUNITY HISTORIES/COMMENTARIES AND BY THE CONDUCT OF RELATED EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS, WORKSHOPS, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES, OR BY SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 7
Compton Court
Compton Road
Wolverhampton
WV3 9QA
- Phone:
- 01902321401
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window