Financial history AFTERMATH SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1111298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.73k £45.18k £40.56k £63.43k £66.60k
Total expenditure £57.61k £55.33k £76.11k £98.27k £110.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A