MANKIND UNITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling and workshop sessions addressing related issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackpool
Governance
- 31 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURVINDER GIDAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Holly Louise Fields | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Terry Dugmoreshaw | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16TH FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 9TH AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG PERSONS IN BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE SINGLE PARENTS, OR WHO ARE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF ALCOHOL OR OTHER SUBSTANCE ABUSE, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND WORKSHOPS SESSIONS ADDRESSING RELATED ISSUES.
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Grosvenor Street
BLACKPOOL
FY1 3DX
- Phone:
- 07477061666
- Email:
- asfamily2000@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window