Financial history OCEAN SOMALI COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1115114
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £186.47k £158.67k £108.02k £50.06k £23.04k
Total expenditure £178.68k £156.10k £127.11k £21.78k £33.99k
Income from government contracts £54.00k N/A £31.58k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £80.03k N/A N/A N/A N/A