OAKDALE HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and provide facilities for recreation and health benefits for disadvantaged inhabitants of Luton (Please see annual report for more details)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
Governance
- 21 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZAHIER NAZAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KAMRAN KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HASEEB AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RASHID NAZAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.07k | £77.92k | £105.61k | £65.76k | £57.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.30k | £68.04k | £62.87k | £63.32k | £55.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.87k | £36.48k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 30 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LUTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LUTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oakdale House
233a Dunstable Road
Luton
LU4 8BN
- Phone:
- 01582486633
- Website:
-
oakdalehousetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window