THE FRIENDS OF BELL FARM SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engage in activities, provide facilities/equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Hughes | Trustee | 19 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Boele van Hensbroek | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Doyle | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Barnfield | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Satinderjit Metha | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Holmes | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Jane Munro | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Kate Herringshaw | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Joy Gaydon | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross Herringshaw | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Graham | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Punamdeep Kaur Sofat | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.32k | £7.43k | £23.49k | £33.73k | £37.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.56k | £4.89k | £13.88k | £44.82k | £55.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 October 2022 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 2004. AS AMENDED ON 03 MAR 2021 as amended on 03 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HERSHAM, ELMBRIDGE, SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bell Farm Primary School
Hersham Road
Hersham
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 5NB
- Phone:
- 01932224009
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window