PAPERCHASE FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has the general aim of contributing to the quality of life of Paperchase Products Limited employees and affiliates.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 2005: Standard registration
- 19 June 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- BORDERS GROUP FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65k | £4.03k | £2.43k | £2.16k | £1.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £11.11k | £10.39k | £2.64k | £711 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 January 2022 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAY 2005 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
3.1) GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF EMPLOYEES OF BORDERS (UK) LTD AND ITS AFFILIATES, PARENTS AND SUBSIDIARIES AND THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS, HUSBANDS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN, PARENTS, OTHER DEPENDANTS AND ANY PERSON LIVING WITH SUCH EMPLOYEE AS HIS OR HER PARTNER (THE "IMMEDIATE FAMILY") THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO THOSE WHO HAVE DEMONSTRATED FINANCIAL NEED IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 3.2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window