Financial history FRIENDS OF WORTHAM SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1109206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.69k £1.77k £4.11k £3.11k £2.84k
Total expenditure £1.30k £5.74k £1.92k £4.11k £4.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A