Financial history THE HOLLINGBOURNE MEADOWS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1109396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.98k £29.18k £30.06k £12.91k £14.89k
Total expenditure £30.37k £21.77k £33.36k £25.17k £22.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £660 £2.25k N/A N/A N/A