TRACK 2000
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cardiff
Governance
- 10 May 2005: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- COMMUNITY RESOURCE SERVICES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF PERSONS WITH A TRAINING NEED BY THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE FACILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PRACTICE BASIC AND MORE SPECIALISED SKILLS. 3.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF RENOVATED FURNITURE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. MID GLAMORGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.