Accounts and annual returns HOUSE OF JOY, SOUTH WALES

Charity number: 1109560
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 13 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 13 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2015 02 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 25 January 2016 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2014 02 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 February 2015 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2013 28 May 2014 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 02 May 2014 86 days late