MODERN MASTERPIECES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Modern Masterpieces exists to develop and promote the work of choreographer and artist Michael Clark who is widely recognised as one of this country's most significant dancers and choreographers to emerge in the last 20 years. It also aims to support Clark in his artistic development, to build audiences and promote awareness of his work in this country and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £203,836 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 May 2005: Standard registration
- MICHAEL CLARK COMPANY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Bonacina | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGOT HENDERSON | Trustee | 22 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
VAL BOURNE CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £699.44k | £536.67k | £222.35k | £274.31k | £219.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £616.60k | £597.81k | £256.17k | £228.58k | £269.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £201.15k | N/A | N/A | £203.84k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £311.56k | £239.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £387.81k | £296.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £60 | £34 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £616.60k | £597.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £196 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £1.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
(A) THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARBICAN CENTRE FOR ARTS &
CONFERENCES
SILK STREET
BARBICAN
LONDON
EC2Y 8DS
- Phone:
- 02073827170
- Email:
- info@michaelclarkcompany.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window