THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MICHAEL'S SUTTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the benefit of repair and improvements to St. Michael's church, Sutton, Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 April 2005: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY STEEL NICHOLLS | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr James Thallon | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Smith | Trustee | 24 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAUDIA ALBERTA MAKEPEACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £3.10k | £18.06k | £9.89k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.19k | £638 | £2.56k | £60 | £30.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE PRESERVATION RESTORATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD OF ST MICHAELS SUTTON IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") INCLUDING ITS MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS.
Area of benefit
NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Delane Road
Drayton
Norwich
Norwich
Norfolk
NR8 6DL
- Phone:
- 01603404361
- Email:
- margaretbaker0649@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window