THE DANIEL'S DREAM PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The DDP is a proactive organisation directly involved with promoting and creating opportunities for disabled people to go sailing at the intermediate and advanced level both in the UK and the wider World. We have recently worked with IFDS, RYA, Helenic Yachting Association (EIO), Portugese Yachting Association (FPV) and Disabled sailing Ontario.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- France
- Greece
- Ireland
- Netherlands
- Portugal
Governance
- 08 June 2005: Standard registration
- 17 March 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 March 2015: Funds transferred to 1086651 CHALLENGER CLASS ASSOCIATION
- DANIEL'S DREAM PROJECT (Working name)
- DAN'S DREAM (Working name)
- DDP (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £63 | £6.50k | £902 | £25 | |
|
Total expenditure | £987 | £343 | £635 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 26 November 2014 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 09 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 18 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISABILITY AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF DISABLED PEOPLE AROUND THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE SAILING IN THE CHALLENGER TRIMARAN AND BY WORKING TOWARDS MAKING THE CHALLENGER A PARALYMPIC BOAT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window