Accounts and annual returns THE EAST LANCASHIRE HEAD AND NECK CLINIC

Charity number: 1110351
Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required