Accounts and annual returns WHITEPARISH ALL SAINTS PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1109517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 July 2022 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 July 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 July 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required